MA H2548 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the maximum age requirement for police officers for the city of Methuen. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the maximum age requirement for police officers for the city of Methuen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-01-29SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2024-01-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-12-21HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-21HouseRules suspended
2023-12-21HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-11-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-03-29JointHearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4028 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4041 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2024
H4510 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback