MA H254 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative alcoholic beverages licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to license caps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2149 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H296 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H296 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H254.pdf |