MA H2504 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2150
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the registration and taxation of marine vessels. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the modernization of boat registration and marine vessels
Sponsors
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2150 |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2150 (Replaced by) 2016-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2992 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
H286 (Similar To) 2016-03-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4118
H669 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2873 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H287 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H2992 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
H286 (Similar To) 2016-03-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4118
H669 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2873 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H287 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2504 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2504.pdf |