MA H2331 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4271
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale of dietary supplements for weight loss and muscle building. Public Health.
Title
Protecting children from harmful diet pills and muscle-building supplements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4271 |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1600 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1525 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H4271 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H226 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1525 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H4271 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H226 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2331 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2331.pdf |