MA S1525 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4271
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect children from harmful diet pills and muscle-building supplements. Public Health.
Title
Protecting children from harmful diet pills and muscle-building supplements
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4271 |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2150 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2022
S1321 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Accompanied H2150
H4271 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2331 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
S1321 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Accompanied H2150
H4271 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2331 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4271
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1525 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1525.pdf |