MA H2288 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of anesthesia on a fetus prior to an abortion. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to unborn children
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4863 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4863 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2288 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2288.pdf |