MA H228 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5261
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to eliminate disproportionality and inequities for at-risk children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To eliminate disproportionality and inequities for at-risk children
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5261 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S139 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
H5261 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5261 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H228 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H228.pdf |