MA S139 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2914
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to eliminate disproportionality and inequities for at-risk children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To eliminate disproportionality and inequities for at-risk children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2914 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H228 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5261
H1579 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S91 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
H2115 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S2914 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1579 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S91 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
H2115 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S2914 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S139 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S139.pdf |