MA H2172 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 103-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing a paid family and medical leave insurance program. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a paid family and medical leave insurance program

Sponsors

Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]
Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Rep. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]
Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Peter Kocot [D]Rep. Robert Koczera [D]Rep. Stephen Kulik [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Juana Matias [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]
Rep. James Miceli [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. William Straus [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13JointHearing rescheduled to 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-05-11SenateSenate concurred
2017-05-10HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S578 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in 437
H626 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1385 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
S1384 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
S582 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H588 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1332 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H497 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H587 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H498 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H34 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback