MA H2161 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the siting of solid waste facilities. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Further regulating siting of solid waste facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Turco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4933 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H162 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H916 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2135 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2217 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H4933 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H916 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2135 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2217 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H4933 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2161.pdf |