MA H2144 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Carey of Easthampton and Senator Comerford, a joint petition of Daniel R. Carey and Joanne M. Comerford that the Hampshire County Regional Housing Authority be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in the town of South Hadley to the South Hadley Housing Authority. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the Hampshire County Regional Housing Authority to convey a certain parcel of land in the town of South Hadley to the South Hadley Housing Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-11-17 | House | Enacted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday November 17, 2021 |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-10-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-07-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-07-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
H3867 (Similar To) 2022-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2022
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2064 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S3073
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H5148 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
H5150 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022
H5147 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3062
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
H3867 (Similar To) 2022-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2022
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2064 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S3073
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H5148 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
H5150 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022
H5147 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3062
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2144 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2144.pdf |