MA S2064 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3073
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S3073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S3073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant easements to the town of Hubbardston for the reconstruction of the Evergreen Road bridge over Mason Brook. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant easements to the town of Hubbardston for the reconstruction of the Evergreen Road bridge over Mason Brook
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S3073 |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S3073 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
S3073 (Replaced by) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2022
H5154 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3073
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
S3073 (Replaced by) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2022
H5154 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3073
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2064.pdf |