MA H2115 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5194
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a statewide children’s mental health ombudsman program within the Office of the Child Advocate. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Protecting children's mental health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5194 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H3067 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1074 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H277 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
H5194 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H226 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1074 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H277 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
H5194 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H226 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2115.pdf |