CA AB2058 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 111612 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Automated decision systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111612 | New Code | See Bill Text |