CT HB05225 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recent recommendations of the Invasive Plants Council by prohibiting the sale and cultivation of certain plants determined to be invasive or potentially invasive.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Invasive Plants Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 213 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-08 | House | Public Act 24-11 |
2024-05-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 345 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Passed |
2024-03-21 | House | File Number 84 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 87 |
2024-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |