MA H1074 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to auditory healthcare coverage for children. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to children's auditory health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-29JointHearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H3067 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1005 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
H1737 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H277 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S103 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence
H230 (Similar To) 2021-08-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S87 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1439 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2261
S498 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback