MA H2060 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4444
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the equitable assessment of banking fees imposed on accounts for personal, family or household purposes. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the equitable assessment of bank fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4444 |
2011-12-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4444 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2060 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9488&generalCourtId=1 |