MA H2057 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1196
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-06 - Accompanied S1196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-06 - Accompanied S1196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an Alzheimer’s project in the Office of the Secretary of Health and Human Services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Alzheimer’s Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | Senate | Accompanied S1196 |
2015-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1196 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2057 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2057.pdf |