MA H2055 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4723
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow the use of sunscreen in all public schools in the commonwealth. Education.
Title
Relative to student sun safety
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] |
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4723 |
2017-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4723 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4723 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2055 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2055.pdf |