MA H1968 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4242

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to ovarian cancer prevention, screening, education and support programs. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission on ovarian cancer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4242
2015-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H455 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1163 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H4017 (Similar To) 2016-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2016
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback