MA H382 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4298

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require parental notification prior to the taking of student surveys in the public schools regarding personal or private issues. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding surveys in public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4298
2015-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-05-01HouseHearing on 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 cancelled
2015-04-28JointHearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4298 (Replaced by) 2016-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1709 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback