MA H385 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4599

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish an opt-out admissions lottery process for charter schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate School Enrollment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-06HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4599
2015-10-07JointHearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-05-19HouseHearing on 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 cancelled
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4599 (Replaced by) 2016-09-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1709 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback