MA H4298 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School climate, Safety, and Student Discipline and Vocational Technical Education, Collaboratives, and Regional Schools
Title
School climate, Safety, and Student Discipline and Vocational Technical Education, Collaboratives, and Regional Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-05-16 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2016-05-16 | House | Accompanied by H328, H337, H355, H357, H368, H369, H382, H399, H421, H456, H477, H496, H502, H509 and H510 |
2016-05-16 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H328 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H337 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H355 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H357 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H368 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H369 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H382 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H399 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H421 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H456 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H477 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H496 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H502 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H509 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H510 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H3683 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S2013 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Reported (in part) by S2048
H337 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H355 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H357 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H368 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H369 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H382 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H399 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H421 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H456 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H477 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H496 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H502 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H509 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H510 (Replaces) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H3683 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S2013 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Reported (in part) by S2048
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4298 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4298.pdf |