MA H455 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H499

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to vocational-technical schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study vocational-technical schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2015-07-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2015-07-23HouseAccompanied by H499
2015-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H499 (Replaces) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied H455
H4017 (Similar To) 2016-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2016
H1968 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1163 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H4389 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4548
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S1057 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1160 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback