MA H4017 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Denise Martinez, an employee of the Massachusetts Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Denise Martinez, an employee of the Massachusetts Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-25 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2016
2016-03-16SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2016-03-14HouseEnacted
2016-03-14SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2016-03-14HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2016-03-10SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2016-03-10SenateRules suspended
2016-03-10SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2016-02-25SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-02-25HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2016-02-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-02-24HouseRules suspended
2016-02-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-02-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-02-18SenateSenate concurred
2016-02-16HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2016-02-11HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H1080 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H790 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1886 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3550 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4303
H3851 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback