MA H1965 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4792
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residency verification for persons seeking certain benefits from the Commonwealth. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to proof of residency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4792 |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/24/2017 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S39 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4006 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2270 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2339
H4792 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S39 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4006 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2270 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2339
H4792 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1965 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1965.pdf |