MA H1902 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4089

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the sale or distribution of flavored tobacco products. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating flavored tobacco products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4089
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H377 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H805 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4311
H2902 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H785 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H2029 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4425
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2910 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H738 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
H4089 (Replaced by) 2019-11-12 - New draft substituted, see H4183
H4185 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Adopted
H4183 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback