MA H4089 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1902
Note: Legislation replaced by H4183
Note: Legislation replaced by H4183
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - New draft substituted, see H4183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - New draft substituted, see H4183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating flavored tobacco products
Title
Regulating flavored tobacco products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | House | New draft substituted, see H4183 |
2019-11-12 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2019-11-12 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4183 |
2019-09-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-09-26 | House | New draft of H1902 |
2019-09-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1902 (Replaces) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4089
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H9 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H738 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H785 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H4183 (Replaced by) 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
H4185 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Adopted
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H9 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H738 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H785 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H4183 (Replaced by) 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
H4185 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Adopted
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4089 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4089.pdf |