MA H377 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to regulate online gaming, daily fantasy, and online sports betting. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate online gaming, daily fantasy, and online sports betting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H366 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H349 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H378 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H805 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Senate concurred
H1503 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1663 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2292 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1378 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H255 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1342 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1902 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback