MA H188 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing guardians as providers of medical care to support the rights of incapacitated persons. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing guardians as providers of medical care to support the rights of incapacitated persons
Sponsors
Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S108 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H1623 (Similar To) 2023-10-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1623 (Similar To) 2023-10-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H188.pdf |