MA H1858 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Nantucket be authorized to exclude the fuel revolving account for the Nantucket Memorial Airport in calculating the limit on revolving account funds. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Nantucket Memorial Airport Fuel Revolving Account
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-05-23 | House | Enacted |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-06-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-05-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-05-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in 428 |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing on 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in 428 cancelled |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2782 (Similar To) 2016-09-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2016
H2152 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
H902 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1473 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2152 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
H902 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1473 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1858 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1858.pdf |