MA H1790 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to safe in-patient alcoholism or substance abuse treatment locations. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Relative to safe in-patient alcoholism or substance abuse treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4272 |
2015-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4272 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1790 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1790.pdf |