MA H1727 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of an employee under the labor laws for certain persons performing services. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the definition of an independent contractor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4604 |
2015-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4604 (Replaced by) 2016-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1727 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1727.pdf |