MA H1676 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require each executive agency to post relevant Code of Massachusetts Regulations (CMR) on said agency’s website. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to online posting of CMR’s
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4465 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4795
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1676 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1676.pdf |