MA H1669 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to overtime pay. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To harmonize wage laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1599 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1092 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
S2313 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback