MA H1532 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4624
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the fresh and continued pursuit of motor vehicle operators by police officers outside of the jurisdiction of said officers. The Judiciary.
Title
Improving apprehension of drunk drivers and other law violators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4624 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4624 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1532 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1532.pdf |