MA H1492 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2355
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a nursing advisory board within the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Health.
Title
Creating a nursing advisory board
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4533 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2012-03-05 | House | Accompanied by H2355 |
2011-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2355 (Replaces) 2012-03-05 - Accompanied H1492
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1492 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8614&generalCourtId=1 |