MA H1436 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5273

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a statewide right to counsel program for evictions to promote housing stability and prevent homelessness. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting housing stability and homelessness prevention in Massachusetts

Sponsors

Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Rob Consalvo [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]
Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Orlando Ramos [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]
Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5273
2022-05-16SenateSenate concurred
2022-05-12HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-02-22SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-17HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday March 1, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-10-05JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
H1372 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5269
H1385 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5273 (Replaced by) 2022-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback