MA S874 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote housing stability and homelessness prevention through a right to counsel pilot program in Massachusetts in response to the COVID-emergency. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting housing stability and homelessness prevention in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-16SenateSenate concurred
2022-05-12HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-02-22SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-17HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday March 1, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1436 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Senate concurred
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
H2397 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
H4218 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Adopted
H4219 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Published as amended, see H4234
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - House concurred
S250 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Senate concurred
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S2276 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - New draft substituted, see S2612
S82 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S125 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback