MA H1385 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Decker of Cambridge and Miranda of Boston, a petition of Marjorie C. Decker, Liz Miranda and others that the Department of Housing and Community Development administer a residential assistance for families in transition homelessness prevention program. Housing.
Title
Providing upstream homelessness prevention assistance to families, youth, and adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2662 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2661 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
S111 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1985 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1987 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H2662 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2661 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
S111 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1985 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1987 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1385 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1385.pdf |