MA H1377 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5351
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to impose a fee up to 2 per cent of the purchase price upon the transfer of certain real property. Housing.
Title
Empowering cities and towns to support affordable housing with a fee on certain real estate transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5351 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-21 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5137 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5351 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2867 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5137 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5351 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2867 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1377 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1377.pdf |