MA H432 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to returning liquor license control to cities and towns. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Returning liquor license control to municipalities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H431 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2477 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2022
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
H3640 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback