MA H1368 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4697
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the hunger-free campus initiative to address college student food insecurity and hunger on public higher education campuses. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts hunger-free campus initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4697 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S822 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2811
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S846 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2815
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2811 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4697 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S432 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S564 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S846 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2815
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2811 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4697 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S432 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S564 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1368 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1368.pdf |