MA S564 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a food justice frontline. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to establishing a food justice frontline
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Nick Collins [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Accompanied by H973 |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1368 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
S432 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H973 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S564
S2052 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
H4697 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S432 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H973 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S564
S2052 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
H4697 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S564 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S564.pdf |