MA S822 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2811
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Hunger-Free Campus Initiative. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts Hunger-Free Campus Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2811 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1368 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S427 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S2811 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4697 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3321 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H2542 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S427 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S2811 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4697 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3321 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H2542 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S822 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S822.pdf |