MA H1362 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residential preference for financial aid at public institutions of higher education. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to college tuition and admissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5174 |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S840 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S840 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1362 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1362.pdf |