MA H1358 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase access and financing for smart growth developments. Housing.
Title
To increase access and financing for smart growth developments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5035 |
2024-07-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H237 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H240 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2689 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Hearing scheduled for 03/20/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5035 (Replaced by) 2024-09-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H240 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2689 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Hearing scheduled for 03/20/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5035 (Replaced by) 2024-09-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1358.pdf |