MA H1335 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the crime of resisting or obstructing public safety personnel in the performance of their duties. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the penalty for resisting a police officer
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1333 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H2288 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4098
H2076 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2146
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2230 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3613 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H2288 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4098
H2076 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2146
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2230 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3613 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1335 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1335.pdf |