MA H3823 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Avon be authorized to appoint retired police officers to serve as special police officers. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the appointment of retired police officers in the town of Avon to serve as special police officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
2019-08-12SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-08-12HouseEnacted
2019-08-08SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2019-08-08SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-07-29SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-07-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-07-16HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-07-16HouseRules suspended
2019-07-16HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-07-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-03SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
H1333 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1335 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-08-22 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback