MA H1293 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require annual reports by certain accountable care organizations. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to accountable care organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied S780 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1279 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H466 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S780 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H466 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S780 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1293 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1293.pdf |